Williams, William Lewis (CPSO#: 28371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-4204
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM LEWIS WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2012