Williamson, Jon Scott (CPSO#: 67662)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1994 to 30 Apr 1994
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Apr 2006