Williamson, Kimberly Ann (CPSO#: 32590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Names: Williamson, Kimberly Ann (used until: 21 Dec 1993 )     Williamson-Hnatyshyn, Kimberly Ann (used until: 26 Jun 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Emergency Department
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-4941 Ext. 38510
Fax: (905) 573-4842
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3730
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton Ontario
Canada
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 876-7606
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
327 Reynolds Street
Oakville ON  L6J 3L7
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberly Williamson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Williamson ( CPSO# 32590 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 876-7606

Business Address:
Emergency Department
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
327 Reynolds Avenue
Oakville ON  L6J 3L7
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ANN WILLIAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1981