Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Willinsky, Robert Alan (CPSO#: 29155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5529
Fax: (416) 603-5981
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Robert Willinsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Willinsky ( CPSO# 29155 )

Business Address:
The Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5981

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ALAN WILLINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLINSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1977