Williot, Pierre (CPSO#: 56676)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 27 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992