Willis Jr, Ross Baxter (CPSO#: 29729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. Ext. 2582
Fax: (613) 738-4840
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baxter Willis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Willis Jr ( CPSO# 29729 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSS BAXTER WILLIS JR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIS JR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2004