Willis, Kenneth Richard (CPSO#: 27890)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth R. Willis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 2005 Hollybrook Crescent, Ottawa, ON K1J 7Y5
Date Received: 04 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016