Willms, Joanna Lillian Vanderwagen (CPSO#: 103734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Willow Family Physicians
325 University Avenue
Kingston ON  K7L 3R4
Phone: 6135442902
Fax: (613) 544-5768
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA LILLIAN VANDERWAGEN WILLMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLMS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2016