Willoughby, Joanne Susan (CPSO#: 55395)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 107
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 836-7326
Fax: (519) 763-5440
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne Willoughby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Willoughby ( CPSO# 55395 )

Business Address:
107 - 89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 836-7326

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE SUSAN WILLOUGHBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLOUGHBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1987