Wilson, Amanda Helen Dean (CPSO#: 93431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Dundas Street West, Suite 305
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z5
Phone: (416) 217-3931
Fax: (416) 217-1161
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1700 Bloor St W
Toronto ON  M6P 4C3
Canada
Phone: 416 604-3361
Fax: 416 604-3367
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA HELEN DEAN WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2013