Wilson, Aze Suzanne Aliu (CPSO#: 88377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Division of Gastroenterology
PO box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3832
Fax: (519) 663-3220
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

310 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 4P4
Canada
Phone: (519) 433-4700
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aze Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wilson ( CPSO# 88377 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus
Division of Gastroenterology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Centric Health London Scoping Centre
310 Wellington Road
London ON  N6V 4P4
Phone Number: (519) 433-4700

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre University Campus
Division of Gastroenterology
PO Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZE SUZANNE ALIU WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Oct 2013 to 20 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012