Wilson, Carolyn Ruth (CPSO#: 29877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
P O Box 8888
Station Main
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9303 Ext. 73989
Fax: (613) 544-0132
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wilson and Casson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Casson ( CPSO# 29356 )
Dr. C. Wilson ( CPSO# 29877 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Family Medicine Centre
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN RUTH WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1978