Wilson, Christine Margaret (CPSO#: 53438)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Sep 1983
Elective Trainee - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1983 to 31 Dec 1983
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008