Wilson, Dana Follette (CPSO#: 54078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
71 King Street West
Suite 406
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 275-7327
Fax: (905) 275-1094
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dana Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wilson ( CPSO# 54078 )

Business Address:
Suite 406
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 275-7327

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA FOLLETTE WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1985