Wilson, George Andrew Charles (CPSO#: 26621)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. A. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 24 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: HandstheFamilyHelp Network 26 Bill's Drive Bracebridge, ON P1L 1T1 Telephone: 705-645-3155 or 1-800-668-8555 Website: www.HandstheFamilyHelpnetwork.ca
Date Received: 30 Sep 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2015