Wilson, Ian Chisholm (CPSO#: 13497)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Dec 1956 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 2002