Wilson, James William Lennox (CPSO#: 32100)

Current Status: Active Member - CPSO Staff as of 16 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Urology
Kingston General Hospital
Queen's University
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2493
Fax: (613) 545-1970
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James W.L. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wilson ( CPSO# 32100 )

Business Address:
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Empire 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2493

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES WILLIAM LENNOX WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1980