Wilson, Janet Helen (CPSO#: 32761)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Mar 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2016