Wilson, Jennifer Leslie (CPSO#: 71230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone: (905) 852-1009
Fax: (905) 852-3531
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer L. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wilson ( CPSO# 71230 )

Business Address:
2 Elgin Park Drive
Unit B
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 852-1009

Business Address:
Cottage Hospital
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LESLIE WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 04 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2000