Wilson, Jonathan Jay (CPSO#: 32575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1981


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
960 Lawrence Ave W
Suite 508
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 249-4367
Fax: (416) 249-9433
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 10 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. JONATHAN JAY WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1981