Wilson, Maithili Kamala (CPSO#: 59813)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maithili Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Royal Health Care, P O Box 92, 130 Adelaide Street West, Toronto, ON, M5H 3P5
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016