Wilson, Mary Louise (CPSO#: 69274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Algoma Regional Cancer Program
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4450
Fax: (705) 759-3815
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. R. Tull ( CPSO# 93890 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. D. Brooks ( CPSO# 26921 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. E. Beduhn ( CPSO# 26647 )
Dr. E. Barrett ( CPSO# 56931 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. D. Burrows ( CPSO# 50233 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. S. Fratesi ( CPSO# 27368 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. S. Wilson ( CPSO# 69152 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY LOUISE WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999