Wilson, Michael Benedict (CPSO#: 67763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
189 Red River Road
4th Floor Suite 401 A
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6G9
Phone: (807) 343-7663
Fax: (807) 343-7665
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael B. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 67763 )

Business Address:
189 Red River Road
4th Floor Suite 401 A
Box 4500
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6G9
Phone Number: (807) 343-7663

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BENEDICT WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1996