Wilson, Murray Edward (CPSO#: 57923)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Dec 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013