Wilson, Ronald Harold (CPSO#: 20728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Nov 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5D
1099 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B4
Phone: (416) 449-2807
Fax: (416) 449-0054
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 302
2025 Midland Ave.
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 449-2807
Fax: (416) 449-0054
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1963 to 14 Jun 1964
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1964 to 30 Jun 1965
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2002
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2002
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 11 Nov 2004

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2002 Active View Details [+]
            The  following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate
            of registration held by Dr. Ronald Harold Wilson:

            *     Dr.  Wilson is suspended from practising as a neurologist for a period of
                  two years  from  November  12,  2002.   Therefore,  the  suspension  will
                  terminate effective November 11, 2004 at 11:59 p.m.

            *     Dr.  Wilson  will  be  banned  for  life from acting in the capacity of a
                  medical director.

            *     Dr. Wilson will take such remedial course  or  courses as recommended and
                  which are recognized by the Canadian and American Neurological Societies.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Aug 2002
Summary:

 On August 21, 2002, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found Dr. Ronald Harold Wilson guilty of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession and engaged in conduct that members would find disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional in relation to the performance of electroencephalograms on 
 patients using needle electrodes.

The Committee also found Dr. Wilson to be incompetent in his 
 professional care of patients displayed a lack of judgement and disregard for the welfare of his 
 patients of a nature and to an extent that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue in practice 
 or that his paractice should be restricted.

On November 12, 2002, the Discipline ordered that Dr. 
 Wilson's certificate of registration be revoked effective immediately.

Dr. Wilson appealed the 
 decision of the Discipline Committee on December 11, 2002.  On November 5, 2003, the Superior 
 Court of Justice (Divisional Court) upheld the findings of professional misconduct and 
 incompetence, however, set aside the penalty of revocation.

The Divisional Court substituted the 
 following penalty: a two-year suspension from practising as a neurologist from November 12, 2002, 
 a lifetime ban from acting in the capacity of a medical director and such remedial course(s) as 
 recommended by the College expert, which are recognized by the Canadian and American Neurological 
 Societies.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 05 Nov 2003
Hearing Date(s): Mar 04, 2002