Wilson, Ruth Kate (CPSO#: 84431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4-55 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone: (705) 324-2581
Fax: (705) 328-1816
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Angeline St N
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Canada
Phone: 705-324-6111 Ext. 3544
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruth K. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wilson ( CPSO# 84431 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6191

Business Address:
4 - 55 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone Number: (705) 324-2581

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH KATE WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008