Wilson, Sophie Eleanor Roberta (CPSO#: 74833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: Wilson, Sophie (used until: 16 Apr 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
751 Victoria St South
Suite B106
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone: 519-748-8510
Fax: 888-706-0513
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 University Avenue
Building 2204
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Canada
Phone: 519-888-4567
Fax: 519-888-4060
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

200 University Avenue
Waterloo, Ontario
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Canada
Phone: 519-888-4567
Fax: 519-888-4060
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sophie E. R. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wilson ( CPSO# 74833 )

Business Address:
Suite B106
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (519) 748-8510

Business Address:
Health Services Building 2204
200 University Avenue
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Phone Number: (519) 888-4096

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIE ELEANOR ROBERTA WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2002