Wilson, Stephanie Ruth (CPSO#: 27517)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie R. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007