Wilton, Michael Bruce (CPSO#: 62191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5-123 Guildwood Parkway
Toronto ON  M1E 4V2
Phone: (416) 269-5088
Fax: (416) 261-3112
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Wilton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wilton ( CPSO# 62191 )

Business Address:
5 - 123 Guildwood Parkway
Toronto ON  M1E 4V2
Phone Number: (416) 269-5088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRUCE WILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1991