Winckel, Christopher Paul (CPSO#: 59621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone: (613) 228-7772
Fax: (613) 228-7776
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Winckel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Winckel ( CPSO# 59621 )

Business Address:
104 - 1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone Number: (613) 228-7772

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PAUL WINCKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINCKEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1989