Winder, Anthony Roy (CPSO#: 53709)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1996