Windrim, Patricia Mary (CPSO#: 70652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-7426
Fax: (416) 867-7498
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARY WINDRIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINDRIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997