Windrim, Sean Gerard (CPSO#: 65781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5038
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Windrim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Windrim ( CPSO# 65781 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5038

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN GERARD WINDRIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINDRIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2008