Wine, Nina Hagler (CPSO#: 66943)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Boston University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 17
531 Atkinson Avenue
Thornhill ON  L4J 8L7
Phone: (905) 763-8660
Fax: (905) 763-0708
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1929 Bayview Avenue
Suite 107
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Canada
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NINA HAGLER WINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997