Winemaker, Mitchell Jeffrey (CPSO#: 63828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
49 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 1N1
Phone: (905) 304-9279
Fax: (905) 304-9280
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

49 Wilson St., Unit 7
Ancaster ON  L9G 1N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 648-6500
Fax: (905) 648-6515
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Juravinski Hospital Site (HHSC)
711 Concession Street
Orthopaedic Clinic
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mitchell Winemaker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Winemaker ( CPSO# 63828 )

Business Address:
7 - 49 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 1N1
Phone Number: (905) 304-9279

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITCHELL JEFFREY WINEMAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINEMAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992