Winemaker, Samantha Paige (CPSO#: 76515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main Street West
DBHSC, 6th Floor
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 28530
Fax: (905) 521-5594
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Services
Henderson Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1V3
Canada
Phone: (905) 389-4411
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA PAIGE WINEMAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINEMAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2005