Winfield, Doris Joanne (CPSO#: 66681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Downs Family Practice
425 University Avenue East, Unit O
Waterloo ON  N2K 4C9
Phone: (519) 569-8821
Fax: (519) 569-8823
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chartwell Elmira,
11 Herbert Street,
Elmira ON  N3B 2B8
Canada
Phone: (519) 669-2921
Fax: (519) 669-3027
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Twin Oaks Of Maryhill
PO Box 10
1360 Maryhill Road
Maryhill ON  N0B 2B0
Canada
Phone: (519) 648-2117
Fax: (519) 648-2570
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Doris Winfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Winfield ( CPSO# 66681 )

Business Address:
University Downs Family Practice
425 University Avenue East
Suite O
Waterloo ON  N2K 4C9
Phone Number: (519) 569-8821

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORIS JOANNE WINFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995