Wing King, Bertram (CPSO#: 22803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A4
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 245-3555
Fax: (416) 222-9604
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bertram Wing King Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wing King ( CPSO# 22803 )

Business Address:
Unit A4
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 245-3555

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 747-3824

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERTRAM WING KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WING KING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Oct 2015
Summary:

On October 14, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wing King committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Wing King did not contest the 
allegation. 
 
Patient A first attended Dr. Wing King’s medical practice in 2012 and returned for a total of five 
medical appointments between 2012 and 2013. She attended on Dr. Wing King in the fall of 
2013 for treatment of a facial rash. Dr. Wing King prescribed a cream for treatment of the rash.   
 
Patient A returned for her scheduled follow up appointment one week later. During that 
appointment, Dr. Wing King noted that the patient’s facial rash was resolving and he provided 
reassurance in this regard. Patient A was concerned about the possibility of permanent scarring 
on her face. At the conclusion of the appointment, Dr. Wing King kissed the patient on the 
forehead and commented, “You look pretty now.”  His conduct was at all times intended to be 
supportive of Patient A. Patient A reported that the kiss was “fatherly” but that it was 
inappropriate in the context of a medical appointment. Patient A did not return to see Dr. Wing 
King. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
- the Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Wing King’s 
certificate of registration, to be removed forthwith once Dr. Wing King provides proof of 
completion of the course to the College:  
  a. Dr. Wing King shall successfully complete the next available course in Understanding 
    Boundaries, at his own expense.    
- Dr. Wing King appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
- Dr. Wing King pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $4,460.00 within 
thirty (30) days of the date of the Order. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 14, 2015