Winger, Michael John (CPSO#: 58729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 114
11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 4M7
Phone: (519) 739-2157
Fax: (519) 739-2160
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. J. Winger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Winger ( CPSO# 58729 )

Business Address:
Suite 114
11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 4M7
Phone Number: (519) 739-2157

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN WINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1988