Wingerin, Ruth Claire (CPSO#: 61548)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 1997


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 1997