Winkler, Heather Debra (CPSO#: 70096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3695 Keele Street
Downsview ON  M3J 1N2
Phone: (416) 633-3711
Fax: (416) 633-0521
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

AMS Toronto
431 King Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1L5
Canada
Phone: (416) 368-6304
Fax: (416) 368-6638
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Winkler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Winkler ( CPSO# 70096 )

Business Address:
3695 Keele Street
Downsview ON  M3J 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 633-3711

Business Address:
AMS Toronto
431 King Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1L5
Phone Number: (416) 368-6304

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER DEBRA WINKLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINKLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998