Winquist, Eric William (CPSO#: 57309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 685-8808
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Winquist Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Winquist ( CPSO# 57309 )
Dr. A. Vopicka ( CPSO# 55584 )

Business Address:
London Health Science Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC WILLIAM WINQUIST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINQUIST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1987