Winsor, Gordon Maxwell (CPSO#: 21470)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997