Wintemute, Kimberly Joan (CPSO#: 68309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 501
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 223-0555
Fax: (416) 223-0540
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Wintemute Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wintemute ( CPSO# 68309 )

Business Address:
Suite 501
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 223-0555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY JOAN WINTEMUTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINTEMUTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2002 to 27 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2002