Winthrop, Andrea Lynn (CPSO#: 52186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Department of Surgery
Burr 2 Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 2128
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA LYNN WINTHROP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINTHROP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2011