Winton, Timothy Lloyd (CPSO#: 52158)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002