Wirsig, Nadine Mary (CPSO#: 60918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 330
Willowdale ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 497-1375
Fax: (416) 497-4793
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadine Wirsig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wirsig ( CPSO# 60918 )

Business Address:
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 330
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 491-1375

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE MARY WIRSIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIRSIG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1990