Wise, Talya Chana (CPSO#: 83119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Div of Paediatric Emergency Med
Black Wing Room 1447
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-5807
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 103
3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Z3
Canada
Phone: 416-635-5581
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Talya Wise Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Wise ( CPSO# 83119 )

Business Address:
3910 Bathurst Street
Suite 103
Toronto ON  M3H 5Z3
Phone Number: (416) 635-5581

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TALYA CHANA WISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WISE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2010