Wismer, Judy Erma Mclean (CPSO#: 59391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1989

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Wismer, Judy Erma (used until: 08 Sep 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Stone Church Road
Suite 200
Ancaster ON  L9K 1S5
Phone: (905) 304-1122
Fax: (905) 304-3768
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Judy Wismer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wismer ( CPSO# 59391 )

Business Address:
200 - 34 Stone Church Road West
Ancaster ON  L9K 1P4
Phone Number: (905) 304-1122

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDY ERMA MCLEAN WISMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WISMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 21 Sep 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1989

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 1, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)