Wismer, Sandra Jean (CPSO#: 52419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Doon Village Retirement Home
868 Doon Village Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 3A4
Phone: (519) 896-3338
Fax: (519) 896-8787
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Parkwood Suites
720 New Hampshire Street
Waterloo ON  N2K 0A3
Canada
Phone: (519) 772-0702 Ext. 253
Fax: (519) 772-0703
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandra Wismer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wismer ( CPSO# 52419 )

Business Address:
720 New Hampshire Street
Waterloo ON  N2K 0A3
Phone Number: (519) 772-0702

Business Address:
868 Doon Village Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 3A4
Phone Number: (519) 896-8704

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 201 851 Fischer-Hallman Road Kitchener ON N2M 5N8 Telephone: 519-743-1011 Fax: 519-743-0041
Date Received: 17 Dec 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA JEAN WISMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WISMER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1984